Global Patent Index - EP 0975923 A1

EP 0975923 A1 2000-02-02 - METHOD FOR LIQUEFYING A STREAM RICH IN HYDROCARBONS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR LIQUEFYING A STREAM RICH IN HYDROCARBONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VERFLÜSSIGEN EINES KOHLENWASSERSTOFF-REICHEN STROMES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE LIQUEFACTION D'UN COURANT RICHE EN HYDROCARBURES

Publication

EP 0975923 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924120 A

Priority

  • DE 19716415 A
  • EP 9802198 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19716415C1] The invention relates to a method for liquefying a stream rich in hydrocarbons, especially a stream of natural gas, by the indirect exchange of heat with the refrigerants in a closed-circuit cascade of mixed refrigerants. According to the invention, said closed-circuit cascade of mixed refrigerants consists of at least 3 circuits of mixed refrigerants, with each circuit comprising different refrigerants. The first of the three mixed refrigerant circuits is used for pre-cooling (E1), the second for liquefying (E2), and the third for super-cooling (E3) the hydrocarbon-rich stream (1) to be liquefied. The method provided for in the invention reduces specific energy consumption and investment costs since the three circuits of mixed refrigerants are or can be optimally adjusted to the enthalpy temperature curves of the hydrocarbon-rich stream to be liquefied and the refrigerant mixtures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 1/02 (2006.01); F25J 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/0257 (2013.01); F25J 1/0022 (2013.01); F25J 1/004 (2013.01); F25J 1/0052 (2013.01); F25J 1/0055 (2013.01); F25J 1/0217 (2013.01); F25J 1/0238 (2013.01); F25J 1/0248 (2013.01); F25J 1/0262 (2013.01); F25J 1/0264 (2013.01); F25J 1/0283 (2013.01); F25J 1/029 (2013.01); F25J 1/0291 (2013.01); F25J 1/0292 (2013.01); F25J 1/0294 (2013.01); F25J 3/0209 (2013.01); F25J 3/0233 (2013.01); F25J 2200/02 (2013.01); F25J 2200/70 (2013.01); F25J 2215/04 (2013.01); F25J 2220/64 (2013.01); F25J 2290/32 (2013.01); F25J 2290/62 (2013.01); Y10S 62/913 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848227A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK

EPO simple patent family

DE 19716415 C1 19981022; AU 735800 B2 20010712; AU 7643698 A 19981113; EP 0975923 A1 20000202; EP 0975923 B1 20031119; NO 310124 B1 20010521; NO 995046 A 19991122; NO 995046 D0 19991015; RU 2212601 C2 20030920; US 6253574 B1 20010703; WO 9848227 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-02-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040219

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810225 P 20031224

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991111

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK