Global Patent Index - EP 0975925 A1

EP 0975925 A1 2000-02-02 - CARRIER FOR MATERIAL WHICH IS TO BE BAKED

Title (en)

CARRIER FOR MATERIAL WHICH IS TO BE BAKED

Title (de)

BRENNGUTTRÄGER

Title (fr)

SUPPORT POUR PRODUIT A CUIRE

Publication

EP 0975925 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98912364 A

Priority

  • DE 19710045 A
  • DE 19713562 A
  • DE 29801681 U
  • EP 9801007 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9840682A1] The invention concerns a carrier for ceramic products which are to be baked, said carrier having at least one vertical support (4) and ceramic carrier rods (7) which are secured thereto and carry the material to be baked (3). The support (4) is a hollow metal section through which a coolant flows.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27D 5/00; F27B 9/26; F27D 3/12; F27D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F27B 9/26 (2006.01); F27D 3/12 (2006.01); F27D 5/00 (2006.01); F27D 9/00 (2006.01); F27D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 9/00 (2013.01); F27B 9/262 (2013.01); F27D 3/123 (2013.01); F27D 5/0006 (2013.01); F27B 2009/268 (2013.01); F27D 2003/0087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9840682A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9840682 A1 19980917; AT 219571 T 20020715; EP 0975925 A1 20000202; EP 0975925 B1 20020619; ES 2175694 T3 20021116

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130222

2014-04-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140409

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130221

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130221

2013-12-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59804517

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130221

2013-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 219571 T

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120210

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120206

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120208

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120305

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120316

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175694 T3

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804517 20020725

2002-07-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-06-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219571 T 20020715

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011025

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991126

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI