Global Patent Index - EP 0975933 A1

EP 0975933 A1 2000-02-02 - WHEELLESS ALIGNMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD OF USING SAME

Title (en)

WHEELLESS ALIGNMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD OF USING SAME

Title (de)

RADALIGNIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, IHRE BENÜTZUNG OHNE RÄDER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE DU PARALLELISME SANS LES ROUES ET SON UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0975933 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97919994 A

Priority

  • US 9705285 W
  • US 82181397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2284590A1] The wheelless alignment apparatus (20, 22) includes a rigid fixture (90) having a strut assembly coupling portion (96) and a pair of spaced apart support leg portions (92, 94). An adapter plate (30, 32, 34, 36) coupled to the strut assembly coupling portion (96) engages the vehicle strut assembly to secure the adapter plate (30, 32, 34, 36) and the rigid fixture (90) to the vehicle. A pair of support flanges (106, 108) extending from the leg portions (92, 94) and having a group of horizontal offset openings (e.g., 110) cooperates with a pivot bar (18, 19) having two spaced apart pairs of fixture height members (122, 124, 126, 128), each member (122, 124, 126, 128) having a group of vertical offset openings (e.g., 121). The pivot bar (18, 19) rests on a turntable (24, 26), and coupling pins (e.g., 25, 27) extending through corresponding horizontal and vertical offset openings (e.g., 110, 121) enable the rigid fixture (90) to pivot for alignment purposes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01B 5/255

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 5/255 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01B 5/255 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

CA 2284590 A1 19981001; EP 0975933 A1 20000202; EP 0975933 A4 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040610

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021206

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MIELING, JAMES A.

2002-09-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIELING, JAMES A.

2001-03-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991021

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB