Global Patent Index - EP 0975984 A1

EP 0975984 A1 2000-02-02 - DIAGNOSIS OF ELECTRICAL CONSUMERS IN A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

DIAGNOSIS OF ELECTRICAL CONSUMERS IN A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

DIAGNOSE ELEKTRISCHER VERBRAUCHER IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

DIAGNOSTIC DE CONSOMMATEURS ELECTRIQUES DANS UNE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 0975984 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906060 A

Priority

  • DE 9900105 W
  • DE 19801627 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19801627C1] the method involves evaluating an electrical parameter in the on-board electrical network of the vehicle on being initiated by the controller for operating state changes of the load during controller run-down with the engine switched off. The evaluation is terminated by the detection of normal operation. The method is used for loads which are usually driven by the controller with the vehicle operating in normal mode An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for carrying out the method

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 31/00 (2006.01); F02B 77/08 (2006.01); G01M 17/007 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 77/08 (2013.01); Y10T 307/406 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936794A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19801627 C1 19990610; EP 0975984 A1 20000202; EP 0975984 B1 20040811; JP 2001520749 A 20011030; JP 4443635 B2 20100331; US 6122576 A 20000919; WO 9936794 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910180

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140325

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130118

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-06-20 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59910180

- Effective date: 20130422

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120201

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-05-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910180 P 20040916

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000124

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT