Global Patent Index - EP 0976011 A1

EP 0976011 A1 2000-02-02 - DEVICE IN A CHRONOMETER FOR PRESESENTATION IN PARTICULAR OF THE PHASES OF THE MOON

Title (en)

DEVICE IN A CHRONOMETER FOR PRESESENTATION IN PARTICULAR OF THE PHASES OF THE MOON

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG IN EINEM CHRONOMETER, ZUR DARSTELLUNG INSBESONDERE DER MONDPHASEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DANS UN CHRONOMETRE POUR LA PRESENTATION NOTAMMENT DES PHASES DE LA LUNE

Publication

EP 0976011 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97915630 A

Priority

IB 9700408 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9847051A1] The present invention relates to a chronometer for measuring and representing geophysical data by means of a measurement recorder, a measurement converter, a sequencer and a screen (2) intended for displaying the phases of the moon. These phases are computed by means of a digital sequencer and represented on the screen (2) by symbols in the form of pictograms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04G 9/00 (2006.01); G04G 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04G 9/0076 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847051A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9847051 A1 19981022; DE 59711430 D1 20040422; EP 0976011 A1 20000202; EP 0976011 B1 20040317; ES 2214615 T3 20040916; JP 2001519912 A 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130415

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130414

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59711430

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130414

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130414

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120427

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120516

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-11-19 [ET1] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** REVISION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE PATENT OR THE CLAIMS

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2214615 T3

2004-06-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59711430 P 20040422

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE IN A CHRONOMETER FOR PRESESENTATION IN PARTICULAR OF THE PHASES OF THE MOON

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030325

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990902

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI