Global Patent Index - EP 0976026 A1

EP 0976026 A1 2000-02-02 - IMPROVEMENTS IN, OR RELATING TO, SPEECH-TO-SPEECH CONVERSION

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN, OR RELATING TO, SPEECH-TO-SPEECH CONVERSION

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN BEI ODER IN BEZUG AUF SPRACHE-ZU-SPRACHE KONVERSION

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES A LA CONVERSION VOIX-VOIX

Publication

EP 0976026 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97919841 A

Priority

  • SE 9700584 W
  • SE 9601812 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9743707A1] A system and method for speech-to-speech conversion for providing spoken responses to speech inputs in at least two natural languages wherein speech inputs are recognised and interpreted in said at least two languages. The recognised speech inputs are evaluated to determine the language of the speech inputs, and a dialogue is undertaken with a database containing speech information data, in said at least two natural languages, to obtain data for the formulation of spoken responses to the speech inputs. The speech information data, obtained from the database, is then converted into spoken responses which exhibit the language characteristics of the respective speech inputs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 3/16; G10L 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/16 (2006.01); G06F 17/27 (2006.01); G06F 17/28 (2006.01); G10L 13/047 (2013.01); G10L 15/00 (2013.01); G10L 15/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/2881 (2013.01); G06F 3/16 (2013.01); G06F 17/275 (2013.01); G06F 17/289 (2013.01); G10L 13/047 (2013.01); G10L 15/005 (2013.01); G10L 15/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9743707A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9743707 A1 19971120; EP 0976026 A1 20000202; NO 318112 B1 20050131; NO 985178 A 19981111; NO 985178 D0 19981106; SE 519273 C2 20030211; SE 9601812 D0 19960513; SE 9601812 L 19971114

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091224

2009-07-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 3/16 20060101AFI20090605BHEP

2009-07-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G10L 13/04 20060101ALI20090605BHEP

2009-07-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G10L 15/26 20060101ALI20090605BHEP

2007-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELIASONERA AB

2005-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050321

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981214

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE