Global Patent Index - EP 0976037 A1

EP 0976037 A1 2000-02-02 - SCALEABLE DOUBLE PARALLEL DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSOR

Title (en)

SCALEABLE DOUBLE PARALLEL DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSOR

Title (de)

SKALIERBARER DOPPELPARALLELER DIGITALER SIGNALPROZESSOR

Title (fr)

PROCESSEUR DE SIGNAUX NUMERIQUES ECHELONNABLES POUR TRAITEMENT PARALLELE EN DOUBLE

Publication

EP 0976037 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97904970 A

Priority

  • CA 9700164 W
  • US 61333196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9734226A1] A distributed architecture parallel processing apparatus, includes a central microprocessor having at least one external interface connected to a similar interface of a neighboring parallel processor. The processors exchange data and control signals through the interfaces to cooperatively share in the execution of a program. An inter-processor status register in each processor maintains the current status of the processors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/46; G06F 9/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/32 (2006.01); G06F 9/38 (2006.01); G06F 15/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/30036 (2013.01); G06F 9/30094 (2013.01); G06F 9/3879 (2013.01); G06F 9/3881 (2013.01); G06F 9/3885 (2013.01); G06F 9/3887 (2013.01); G06F 15/8015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9734226A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9734226 A1 19970918; CA 2248711 A1 19970918; DE 69719221 D1 20030327; DE 69719221 T2 20031218; EP 0976037 A1 20000202; EP 0976037 B1 20030219; US 5960209 A 19990928

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-10-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69719221 P 20030327

2003-03-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030310

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030310

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030305

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZARLINK SEMICONDUCTOR INC.

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020222

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981005

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE