Global Patent Index - EP 0976040 A1

EP 0976040 A1 2000-02-02 - MANAGEMENT OF INTERRUPTIONS ON A COMPUTER PLATFORM

Title (en)

MANAGEMENT OF INTERRUPTIONS ON A COMPUTER PLATFORM

Title (de)

UNTERBRECHUNGSMANAGEMENT IN EINER COMPUTERPLATTFORM

Title (fr)

GESTION DES INTERRUPTIONS SUR UNE PLATE-FORME INFORMATIQUE

Publication

EP 0976040 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99901674 A

Priority

  • FR 9900199 W
  • FR 9801363 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2774489A1] The invention concerns a computer platform (PF) consisting of at least one unit (M1, M2) comprising each at least one particular processor (PRO1-PRO2, PRO3-PRO5) and at least one particular interruption controller (CI1, CI2), an operating system (SE) including a base kernel (NOY) and enabling to provide extension modules to the base kernel. The invention consists in producing on said platform an extension module external to the base kernel (NOY) for managing interruptions (MEX1, MEX2), thereby relieving the base core from managing interruptions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/4812 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940513A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2774489 A1 19990806; FR 2774489 B1 20000303; EP 0976040 A1 20000202; US 2002032821 A1 20020314; US 6539436 B2 20030325; WO 9940513 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-27 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160629

2009-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BULL SAS

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061016

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000214

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB