Global Patent Index - EP 0976076 A1

EP 0976076 A1 2000-02-02 - AUTOMATED AND INDEPENDENTLY ACCESSIBLE INVENTORY INFORMATION EXCHANGE SYSTEM

Title (en)

AUTOMATED AND INDEPENDENTLY ACCESSIBLE INVENTORY INFORMATION EXCHANGE SYSTEM

Title (de)

AUTOMATISIERTES UND GETRENNT ZUGÄNGLICHES INVENTARISIERUNGS-INFORMATIONSAUSTAUSCHSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME AUTOMATISE D'ECHANGE DE DONNEES D'INVENTAIRE A ACCES INDEPENDANT

Publication

EP 0976076 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97926693 A

Priority

  • US 9708750 W
  • US 1829396 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9746822A1] A method and apparatus of preventing coupled piping from separating while in use comprising providing a locking mechanism (15) onto and near the end of the piping, placing a cam (10) substantially adjacent to the locking mechanism (15), and threadedly engaging the ends of at least two sections of piping together by means of a collar (05), and wherein torque is applied to the sections of piping, further comprising the steps of rotating the collar (05) thereby beginning the disengagement of the collar (05), rotating the cam (10) in the same direction of the collar (05) such that it is displaced away from the locking mechanism (15) and towards the collar (05), mating the cam with the collar (05), and engaging the cam (10) with the locking mechanism (15) thereby preventing the rotation of the cam (10) and thus locking the collar (05).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16L 35/00 (2006.01); G06Q 10/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16L 35/00 (2013.01); G06Q 10/087 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9746822 A1 19971211; AU 3140297 A 19971209; AU 3229297 A 19980105; CA 2255905 A1 19971127; EP 0976076 A1 20000202; EP 0976076 A4 20040414; WO 9744749 A1 19971127

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-20 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20100820

2008-02-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: POINT REYES NATIONAL LIQUIDATION BUYER LLC

2008-02-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PURCELL DANIEL S.

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-04-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040301

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981228

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE