Global Patent Index - EP 0976137 A1

EP 0976137 A1 2000-02-02 - ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES RELAIS

Title (fr)

RELAIS ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 0976137 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98919191 A

Priority

  • DE 19715914 A
  • EP 9801854 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19715914C1] The invention relates to a relay formed by a magnet system (1) which contains a wound coil body (2), an L-shaped core disposed axially therein and an L-shaped armature (4), in addition to a base (6) made of insulating material. Connecting elements (63, 64) protrude from the bottom side of said base, on which fixed (62) and moveable contact elements (61) are arranged. The moveable contact elements (61) are actuated by means of a sliding element (8) coupled to the armature. Fixing prolongations (34) are provided on the magnet system to fix the magnet system (1) to the base (6). Said prolongations engage in elongations (61) of the base (6) that are formed upwards and which firmly connect the magnet system (1) and the base (6). The open end of the transversal limb of the armature (4) is placed on the open end of the longitudinal limb of the core (3). The armature (4) is fixed by means of a U-shaped spring(5) surrounding the armature. Said spring is fixed to the longitudinal limb (41) of the armature by one of its arms. The second arm is inserted in a recess located between the coil body (2) and the core (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/24 (2006.01); H01H 50/04 (2006.01); H01H 50/18 (2006.01); H01H 50/56 (2006.01); H01H 50/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/18 (2013.01); H01H 50/042 (2013.01); H01H 2050/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847163A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19715914 C1 19981008; AT 229225 T 20021215; EP 0976137 A1 20000202; EP 0976137 B1 20021204; JP 2001519087 A 20011016; US 6232858 B1 20010515; WO 9847163 A1 19981022

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-03-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-09-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030910

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806540

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-16

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 229225

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020222

2001-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS AUSTRIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991005

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI