Global Patent Index - EP 0976138 A1

EP 0976138 A1 2000-02-02 - ELECTROMAGNETIC SWITCHING DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC SWITCHING DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES SCHALTGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 0976138 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98929199 A

Priority

  • DE 9800975 W
  • DE 19716380 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19716380C1] The invention relates to an electromagnetic switching device (1) having an electromagnetic driving device (3) that acts as an auxiliary magnetic system, with which, on occurrence of a short-circuit current, the contact force is increased before the contacts (7, 8) are abruptly rifted. To achieve this, the driving device (3) actuates a lever (17) that is rotationally stored on the contact bridge support (11). This lever (17) displaces the contact bridge support (11), thus compressing a contact pressure spring (12) as well as another pressure spring (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 73/02 (2006.01); H01H 50/42 (2006.01); H01H 71/24 (2006.01); H01H 89/08 (2006.01); H01H 77/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/2409 (2013.01); H01H 89/08 (2013.01); H01H 71/2463 (2013.01); H01H 77/101 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848436A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19716380 C1 19981008; CN 1092392 C 20021009; CN 1242868 A 20000126; EP 0976138 A1 20000202; EP 0976138 B1 20020710; JP 2001520798 A 20011030; JP 4056567 B2 20080305; US 6150909 A 20001121; WO 9848436 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050406

2003-07-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010827

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991005

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR IT