Global patent index - EP 0976173 A1

EP 0976173 A1 2000-02-02 - MICROWAVE REFLECTOR ANTENNA

Title (en)

MICROWAVE REFLECTOR ANTENNA

Title (de)

MIKROWELLEN-REFLEKTORANTENNE

Title (fr)

ANTENNE A HYPERFREQUENCES A REFLECTEUR

Publication

EP 0976173 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907317 A

Priority

  • DE 9900354 W
  • DE 19806887 A
  • DE 19848722 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943049A1] A reflector antenna for polarised microwaves has a primary radiator, a subreflector transparent to microwaves of a desired polarisation and a main reflector for reflecting bundled microwaves with a polarisation rotated in the desired direction. The reflector antenna is characterised in that the main reflector is formed by a number of dipoles lying in a plane and having parallel axes inclined at an angle of about 45 DEG with respect to the vector of the incident electrical field. The dipoles are sized in such a way that an 180 DEG phase shift is produced between the reflected electrical field components parallel and perpendicular to the corresponding dipole axis. In addition, the phase of the resultant reflected electrical field is shifted with respect to the phase of the incident electrical field of each dipole in such a way that the total field generated by all dipoles presents even wave fronts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 19/195; H01Q 3/46; H01Q 15/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/46 (2006.01); H01Q 15/22 (2006.01); H01Q 19/185 (2006.01); H01Q 19/195 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 19/185 (2013.01); H01Q 3/46 (2013.01); H01Q 15/22 (2013.01); H01Q 19/195 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943049A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943049 A1 19990826; EP 0976173 A1 20000202; EP 0976173 B1 20120926

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150210

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150210

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20151030

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150210

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59915356

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140211

2015-04-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150406

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-10-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AIRBUS DEFENCE AND SPACE GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59915356

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140916

2014-10-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AIRBUS DEFENCE AND SPACE GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59915356

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120926

2014-09-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-09-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130210

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 577396

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20130210

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-24 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 59915356

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130627

2013-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-09-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20130627

2013-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: EADS DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120926

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120926

2012-12-27 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2393666

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Effective date: 20121227

2012-12-05 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2012-12-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2012-11-29 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R096

- Ref Document Number: 59915356

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121129

2012-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 577396

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20121015

2012-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2012-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2012-09-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061116

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991026

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE