Global Patent Index - EP 0976184 A2

EP 0976184 A2 2000-02-02 - LASER DEVICE

Title (en)

LASER DEVICE

Title (de)

LASERVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF LASER

Publication

EP 0976184 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98931917 A

Priority

  • DE 9801053 W
  • DE 19716422 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848495A2] The invention relates to a laser device with at least one laser diode array with a plurality of adjacently arranged laser diodes. The laser device has an external resonator for coupling the modes of the individual laser diodes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01S 5/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01S 5/40 (2006.01); H01S 5/062 (2006.01); H01S 5/0625 (2006.01); H01S 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01S 5/4062 (2013.01); H01S 5/4068 (2013.01); H01S 3/0632 (2013.01); H01S 5/0624 (2013.01); H01S 5/0625 (2013.01); H01S 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848495A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848495 A2 19981029; WO 9848495 A3 19990128; CA 2286774 A1 19981029; CN 1252901 A 20000510; EP 0976184 A2 20000202

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021207

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-01-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01S 5/40 A

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991005

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL