Global Patent Index - EP 0976236 A1

EP 0976236 A1 2000-02-02 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING MESSAGES IN DIFFERENT LANGUAGES

Title (en)

COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING MESSAGES IN DIFFERENT LANGUAGES

Title (de)

KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UM NACHRICHTEN IN UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN SPRACHEN ZU LIEFERN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION POUR FOURNIR DES MESSAGES DANS DIFFERENTES LANGUES

Publication

EP 0976236 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98921461 A

Priority

  • DE 19715668 A
  • EP 9802181 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19715668A1] Communication system including message devices (BV1 - BV3) for providing messages in one of different languages, wherein a list of at least one preferred language assigned to a subscriber may be entered via subscriber input/retrieval means (EA1, EA2), stored in storage means (S) and be retrieved and displayed from the storage means (S). A list with at least one preferred language, assigned to a calling or called subscriber, may be used to provide a calling and/or called subscribers with a message in one of preferred languages.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/50 (2006.01); H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04M 3/487 (2006.01); H04Q 7/22 (2006.01); H04Q 7/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/487 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847274A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FI FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19715668 A1 19981029; DE 19715668 C2 20011220; AU 741597 B2 20011206; AU 7430998 A 19981111; CA 2287462 A1 19981022; CA 2287462 C 20070410; CN 1260933 A 20000719; EP 0976236 A1 20000202; JP 2001519981 A 20011023; RU 2185036 C2 20020710; WO 9847274 A1 19981022

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20140205

2006-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030819

2004-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL)

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030819

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KEMPER, ELISABETH

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WITZEL, ANDREAS

2000-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KEMPER, ELISABETH

2000-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WITZEL, ANDREAS

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990914

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FI FR GB NL