Global Patent Index - EP 0976280 A1

EP 0976280 A1 2000-02-02 - LOCATION MANAGEMENT AND PAGING METHOD IN A CELLULAR RADIO SYSTEM

Title (en)

LOCATION MANAGEMENT AND PAGING METHOD IN A CELLULAR RADIO SYSTEM

Title (de)

LOKALISIERUNGSMANAGEMENT UND RUFVERFAHREN IN EINEN ZELLULAREN FUNKSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE GESTION DE LOCALISATION ET DE RECHERCHE DANS UN SYSTEME RADIO CELLULAIRE

Publication

EP 0976280 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97927210 A

Priority

  • FI 9700391 W
  • FI 962645 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9750274A1] The invention relates to a location management and paging method in a cellular radio system comprising base stations (BTS1-BTS8) transmitting their own base station identity code and neighbouring cell information as base station information on their own broadcast frequencies, and mobile stations (MS) receiving said information for monitoring base stations. In the location management method according to the invention, the contact area of the mobile station (MS) is stored in connection with each network activity and updated when the mobile station (MS) does not receive any identity belonging to the contact area on the broadcast frequency. The paging method according to the invention utilizes the stored contact area and its neighbouring cell information when paging the mobile station (MS). The invention also relates to a cellular radio system and a mobile station implementing the above-described functionality.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 68/00 (2009.01); H04W 68/04 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 68/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9750274A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9750274 A1 19971231; AU 3178197 A 19980114; EP 0976280 A1 20000202; FI 103556 B1 19990715; FI 103556 B 19990715; FI 962645 A0 19960626; FI 962645 A 19971227; JP 2000512822 A 20000926

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090106

2006-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050315

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050315

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990105

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE