Global patent index - EP 0976338 A1

EP 0976338 A1 2000-02-02 - Buckle for sandals provided with interchangeable camouflage cover

Title (en)

Buckle for sandals provided with interchangeable camouflage cover

Title (de)

Verschluss für Sandalen mit wechselbarer Tarnungsabdeckung

Title (fr)

Boucle pour sandales munie d'un cache de camouflage interchangeable

Publication

EP 0976338 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830484 A

Priority

IT AN980042 U

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a buckle provided with an interchangeable camouflage cover (6) fixed under pressure to the external bearing frame (2) of the buckle, which remains hidden under the camouflage cover (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 11/24; A44B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43C 11/24 (2006.01); A44B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 11/001 (2013.01); A43C 11/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976338 A1 20000202; IT 244864 Y1 20020314; IT AN980042 U1 20000131; IT AN980042 V0 19980731

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020514

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20000404

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI