Global Patent Index - EP 0976339 A1

EP 0976339 A1 2000-02-02 - Buckle for releasably connecting elements

Title (en)

Buckle for releasably connecting elements

Title (de)

Steckverschluss zur lösbaren Verbindung von Bauteilen

Title (fr)

Boucle amovible entre éléments

Publication

EP 0976339 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113298 A

Priority

DE 19834588 A

Abstract (en)

The plug-in fastening comprises a U-sectioned reception part (1) into which fits the plug-in part (2). The outer wall of the plug-in part has a molded inwardly sprung snap-in plate (17) with a surface (18) pointing in a direction contrary to the insertion direction. The transverse wall (4) of the reception part possesses a hole (7) matching the snap-in surface and with opposite facing surface into which the snap-in surface automatically locks. Preferred Features: A second inwardly sprung detent lug (22) is positioned on the insertion part as an extension to the first snap-in plate. The lug has a matching hole (8) in the transverse wall of the reception part.

Abstract (de)

Der vorliegende Steckverschluß dient zur lösbaren Verbindung zweier ineinandersteckbarer Bauteile oder länglicher Gegenstände. Er besteht aus einem im Querschnitt u-förmigen Aufnahmeteil ( 1 ) und einem in dieses einführbaren Steckteil ( 2 ), wobei an der Außenwand des Steckteils ( 2 ) eine nach innen auffederbare Rastplatte ( 17 ) mit entgegen der Einsteckrichtung weisender Rastfläche ( 18 ) angeformt ist und in der Querwand ( 4 ) des Aufnahmeteils ( 1 ) ein der Rastplatte ( 17 ) entsprechendes Loch ( 7 ) mit entgegengerichteter Rastfläche ( 19 ) vorgesehen ist, in welche die Rastplatte ( 17 ) beim Einführen des Steckteils ( 2 ) aufgrund der Federwirkung selbsttätig einrastbar ist. Um die Sicherheit der Verbindung zu erhöhen, ist am Steckteil ( 2 ) in Verlängerung der ersten Rastplatte ( 17 ) eine zweite, nach innen auffederbare Rastnase ( 22 ) vorgesehen, welcher in der Querwand ( 4 ) des Aufnahmeteils ( 1 ) ein entsprechendes Loch ( 8 ) zugeordnet ist. Hierdurch verlängert sich gleichzeitig die Eindringtiefe des Steckteils ( 2 ) in das Aufnahmeteil ( 1 ), so daß damit auch der Schutz gegen Verwindung verbessert wird. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 11/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 11/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 11/263 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976339 A1 20000202; EP 0976339 B1 20011031; DE 19834588 A1 20000203; ES 2166204 T3 20020401

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040710

2005-07-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050709

2005-03-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040710

2004-07-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040709

2003-07-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030708

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030704

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166204 T3

2002-03-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900371 20011206

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI