Global Patent Index - EP 0976347 A3

EP 0976347 A3 2001-03-07 - Folding aid, particularly for garden chairs

Title (en)

Folding aid, particularly for garden chairs

Title (de)

Klapphilfe, insbesondere für Gartenmöbel

Title (fr)

Aide, notamment pour plier une chaise de jardin

Publication

EP 0976347 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108430 A

Priority

  • DE 19833725 A
  • DE 19836757 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0976347A2] The furniture has a lifting element (5) arranged eccentrically to the folding axis (16) of a hinge (1) and mechanically linked to at least one stand leg (2). At least one lifting surface (14) at or in the arm rest (9) receives the stand legs as they are folded against the surface, and maintains the catch (4) of the hinge spaced away from notches on the arm rest.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/026

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/026 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/0265 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976347 A2 20000202; EP 0976347 A3 20010307; DE 19836757 C1 20000323

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030306

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010613

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI