Global Patent Index - EP 0976350 A2

EP 0976350 A2 2000-02-02 - Curtain hanging member

Title (en)

Curtain hanging member

Title (de)

Vorhanghängeelement

Title (fr)

Elément de suspension de rideau

Publication

EP 0976350 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99305866 A

Priority

JP 21703298 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a curtain hanging member with which a curtain can be easily and swiftly attached to the curtain hanging member and the curtain can be fixed firmly in terms of strength. The curtain hanging member includes a strip-shaped support plate (2) which can be disposed horizontally, a fixing plate (3) for attaching a curtain (C1) and provided to be pendent from the support plate (2), male engaging elements (8) of a surface fastener arranged on a front face of the fixing plate (3), and a curtain rail (5) for hanging and sliding a curtain (C2) on a lower face of a rear end of the support plate (2). The support plate (2), the fixing plate (3), and the curtain rail (5) are successively and integrally molded and the male engaging elements (8) are also integrally molded with the fixing plate (3) at the same time by using thermoplastic resin or thermosetting resin by extrusion or injection molding. Female engaging elements (9) of a surface fastener are attached to the curtain (C1) and the curtain (Cl) is fixed by engaging the female engaging elements (9) with the male engaging elements (8) of the fixing plate (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 1/04 (2006.01); A47H 2/00 (2006.01); A47H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47H 15/02 (2013.01); A47H 1/04 (2013.01); A47H 2/00 (2013.01); A47H 13/00 (2013.01); A47H 2201/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H0664591 A 19940308 - AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976350 A2 20000202; EP 0976350 A3 20010110; EP 0976350 B1 20040114; DE 69914135 D1 20040219; DE 69914135 T2 20041111; JP 2000041829 A 20000215

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2005-07-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050721

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040723

2005-01-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-07-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-04-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040425

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914135 P 20040219

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-01-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020314

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010424

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47H 1/00 A, 7A 47H 1/04 B, 7A 47H 13/14 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI