Global Patent Index - EP 0976351 A2

EP 0976351 A2 2000-02-02 - Mounting system for partition elements

Title (en)

Mounting system for partition elements

Title (de)

System zum Befestigen von raumteilenden Elementen

Title (fr)

Système pour la fixation d'éléments de partition

Publication

EP 0976351 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114414 A

Priority

DE 29813591 U

Abstract (en)

At least one room-dividing member (30) is attached to uprights (10, 11) which are retained in position between two fastening points (4, 5) by adhesion and/or clamping. Rod-like cross pieces (20) are provided and uprights and cross pieces are joined together and the room-dividing number is fastened to the uprights and/or cross pieces. Preferably, the uprights are retained between the fastening points by spring-loaded clamping members and can be extended continuously or in steps.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein System zum Befestigen von zumindest einem raumteilenden Element (30) mittels stangenartiger Elemente (10,11,20), wobei stangenartige erste Elemente Ständer (10,11) sind, welche zwischen Befestigungsstellen (4,5) haftend und/oder klemmend arretierbar sind, und stangenartige zweite Elemente Träger (20) sind, und wobei Mittel zum Verbinden von Ständern (10,11) und Trägern (20) und Mittel zum Befestigen des zumindest einen raumteilenden Elementes (30) an den Ständern und/oder Trägern (10,11,20) vorgesehen sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 1/02; A47K 3/28; E04B 2/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/30 (2006.01); E04B 2/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/824 (2013.01); A47K 3/30 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29813591 U1 19981008; EP 0976351 A2 20000202; EP 0976351 A3 20010103

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47H 1/02 A, 7A 47K 3/28 B, 7E 04B 2/74 B, 7A 47K 3/30 B, 7A 47K 3/38 B, 7E 04B 2/82 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI