Global Patent Index - EP 0976356 A2

EP 0976356 A2 2000-02-02 - A hand dryer

Title (en)

A hand dryer

Title (de)

Händetrockner

Title (fr)

Sèche-main

Publication

EP 0976356 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99202357 A

Priority

GB 9816632 A

Abstract (en)

A hand dryer (1) uses warm air to dry hands and faces. The hand dryer (1) also incorporates an ozone generator which is used to generate ozone when the dryer is not been used as such. The generated ozone can be used to disinfect the interior of the housing (2) of the dryer. The ozone can also be circulated out of the housing (2) through an outlet (4), which can then be used to deodorise the external environment (13) in which the dryer (1) is located - such as a washroom. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 10/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976356 A2 20000202; EP 0976356 A3 20010110; GB 2340035 A 20000216; GB 2340035 B 20000809; GB 9816632 D0 19980930; GB 9916349 D0 19990915

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050201

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031014

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47K 10/48 A, 7C 01B 13/11 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI