Global Patent Index - EP 0976376 A3

EP 0976376 A3 2000-06-21 - Ramp step assembly

Title (en)

Ramp step assembly

Title (de)

Rampe oder Treppevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'escalier ou rampe

Publication

EP 0976376 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99304943 A

Priority

GB 9816374 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0976376A2] The invention relates to access apparatus which facilitates movement either by foot or by wheeled transport in and out of ambulances. The apparatus may also be used in hospitals, nursing homes or other permanent structures which are commonly used by able-bodied and wheel-chair users. The access apparatus comprises a combined step and ramp assembly moveable between a first, closed configuration, a second, access configuration in which the step (14) is accessible to persons on foot, and a third, access configuration in which the ramp (22) is accessible to receive wheeled transport.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 3/061 (2013.01); A61G 3/067 (2016.11); A61G 3/068 (2016.11)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976376 A2 20000202; EP 0976376 A3 20000621; EP 0976376 B1 20011219; DE 69900625 D1 20020131; DE 69900625 T2 20020829; GB 9816374 D0 19980923

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100623

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100623

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100623

2010-05-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100415 AND 20100421

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091204

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091210

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1025499

2006-01-06 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2005-02-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-01-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-09-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900625 20020131

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE

2001-04-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000527

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI