Global Patent Index - EP 0976379 A2

EP 0976379 A2 2000-02-02 - Apparatus for producing a water stream or a water/air stream

Title (en)

Apparatus for producing a water stream or a water/air stream

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Erzeugung eines Wasserstroms oder eines Wasser/Luftstroms

Title (fr)

Appareil pour générer un écoulement d'eau ou d'eau/air

Publication

EP 0976379 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98119044 A

Priority

DE 19834341 A

Abstract (en)

The unit includes: an impeller (22) for sucking water across suction openings (12) from the bath and discharges a water flow or water-air flow across outlet openings (13) in the bath; and a hydromotor (18), which drives the impeller (22) across a drive shaft (19). The hydromotor and drive shaft (19) are arranged in the motor mounting (10).

Abstract (de)

Einrichtung zur Erzeugung eines Wasserstroms oder eines Wasser / Luftstroms, vorzugsweise zur Verwendung in einer Whirlpoolwanne (21), umfassend ein in Drehbewegungen versetzbares Laufrad (22, 25), das Wasser über Ansaugöffnungen (12) aus dem Wannenraum ansaugt und einen Wasserstrom bzw. Wasser / Luftstrom über Austrittsöffnungen (13, 27) in den Wannenraum ausstößt, weiter umfassend Antriebsmittel (18) zum Antreiben des Laufrads (22, 25) über eine Antriebswelle (19), wobei diese Antriebsmittel (18) auf der Antriebsachse des Laufrads (22, 25) und vom Wannenraum her gesehen hinter dem Laufrad (22, 25) angeordnet sind, wobei als Antriebsmittel ein Hydromotor (18), ein Pneumatikmotor oder ein mechanischer Antrieb vorgesehen ist. Vorzugsweise sind einer oder mehrere zentrale Leistungsantriebe (30) vorgesehen, über die die Antriebsmittel (18) angetrieben werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 33/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 33/00 (2006.01); A61H 33/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 33/6063 (2013.01); A61H 33/6042 (2013.01); A61H 33/027 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3907552 C1 19900712

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976379 A2 20000202; EP 0976379 A3 20000531; DE 19834341 A1 20000217; DE 19834341 C2 20010412; US 6065161 A 20000523

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61H 33/02 A, 7F 04D 13/04 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI