Global Patent Index - EP 0976379 A3

EP 0976379 A3 2000-05-31 - Apparatus for producing a water stream or a water/air stream

Title (en)

Apparatus for producing a water stream or a water/air stream

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Erzeugung eines Wasserstroms oder eines Wasser/Luftstroms

Title (fr)

Appareil pour générer un écoulement d'eau ou d'eau/air

Publication

EP 0976379 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119044 A

Priority

DE 19834341 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0976379A2] The unit includes: an impeller (22) for sucking water across suction openings (12) from the bath and discharges a water flow or water-air flow across outlet openings (13) in the bath; and a hydromotor (18), which drives the impeller (22) across a drive shaft (19). The hydromotor and drive shaft (19) are arranged in the motor mounting (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 33/02; F04D 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 33/00 (2006.01); A61H 33/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 33/6063 (2013.01); A61H 33/6042 (2013.01); A61H 33/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976379 A2 20000202; EP 0976379 A3 20000531; DE 19834341 A1 20000217; DE 19834341 C2 20010412; US 6065161 A 20000523

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61H 33/02 A, 7F 04D 13/04 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI