Global patent index - EP 0976422 A2

EP 0976422 A2 2000-02-02 - Receptacle for a fire blanket

Title (en)

Receptacle for a fire blanket

Title (de)

Behältnis für eine Löschdecke

Title (fr)

Récipient pour une couverture anti-feu

Publication

EP 0976422 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114862 A

Priority

DE 29813661 U

Abstract (en)

The container has a carrier section (2) with a rear wall (21) and one or more perpendicular sidewalls (22,23). There is a cover (1) with a front wall (11) and one or more perpendicular sidewalls (12). The carrier and cover sections can be positioned so that their sidewalls are superimposed and the container is closed. The fire blanket (4) enclosing section of the cover can have a greater depth than the rest of the sidewalls. The sidewalls supporting the dust cover can have the same depth as their width.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Behältnis für eine Löschdecke, umfassend einen Aufbewahrungsteil 2 aus einer Rückwand 21 und einer oder mehreren senkrecht auf der Rückwand 21 angeordneten Seitenwand/Seitenwänden 22, 23 und einen Abdeckteil 1 aus einer Vorderwand 11 und einer oder mehreren senkrecht auf der Vorderwand 11 angeordneten Seitenwand/Seitenwänden 12, wobei Aufbewahrungsteil 2 und Abdeckteil 1 so ausgebildet sind, daß sie durch Anliegen der jeweiligen Seitenwände 12, 22 aneinander zu einem geschlossenen Behältnis zusammengesetzt werden können, das eine Löschdecke 4 beinhaltet, worin die bei funktionsgerechter Anbringung des Behältnisses die Löschdecke 4 tragenden Seitenwand 23, 3 des Aufbewahrungsteils 2 so ausgebildet ist, daß sie eine größere Tiefe t, t' aufweist als die anderen Teile der Seitenwand 22 oder die anderen Seitenwände 22 des Aufbewahrungsteils 2 des Behältnisses. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 8/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 8/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 8/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29813661 U1 19981015; EP 0976422 A2 20000202; EP 0976422 A3 20010919

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI