Global patent index - EP 0976423 A1

EP 0976423 A1 2000-02-02 - Process and apparatus for extinguishing fires

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for extinguishing fires

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Löschen von Bränden

Title (fr)

Procédé et préparation pour extinction de feux

Publication

EP 0976423 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113153 A

Priority

  • RU 98113952 A
  • RU 98122276 A

Abstract (en)

A gas-aerosol mixture is used to extinguish fires. Process for extinguishing fires comprises: (a) igniting a pyrotechnical composition which guarantees a required combustion temperature profile and a required composition of a gas and aerosol phase producing incomplete burned combustion products; (b) feeding the combustion products through a layer of catalytically active material arranged in the maximum temperature region of the combustion temperature, where the temperatures are kept constant by displacing the temperature profile of the composition; and (c) cooling the completely oxidized combustion products by the combined actions of the materials of high heat absorbing properties. An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for extinguishing fires comprising a housing (1) with an opening (2), a combustion chamber (3) arranged in the housing and heat insulated by the wall of the housing, a cooling plate (9) and a plate (6) for the catalytic complete oxidation. The chamber contains a pyrotechnic composition (4) and an igniter (5).

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren zum Löschen von Bränden, bei dem ein Gas-Aerosol-Gemisch in einen zu schützenden Raum eingeführt wird, umfaßt folgende Schritte: a) Zünden einer pyrotechnischen Zusammensetzung, die ein vorher bestimmtes Verbrennungstemperaturprofil und eine vorher bestimmte Zusammensetzung einer Gas- und Aerosolphase gewährleistet, wobei unvollständig verbrannte Verbrennungsprodukte entstehen; b) Durchführen der Verbrennungsprodukte der pyrotechnischen Zusammensetzung durch eine Schicht eines katalytisch aktiven Stoffes, der im Maximaltemperaturbereich des Verbrennungstemperaturprofils angeordnet ist, wobei die Temperaturen durch Verlagerung des Verbrennungstemperaturprofils der Zusammensetzung konstant gehalten werden, wodurch die unvollständig verbrannten Verbrennungsprodukte vollständig oxidiert werden; c) Kühlen der vollständig oxidierten Verbrennungsprodukte durch Zusammenwirken mit Stoffen hoher wärmeabsorbierender Eigenschaften, wobei sie gleichzeitig nach Zusammensetzung und Größe filtriert werden, Eine Vorrichtung mit dem das Verfahren durchgeführt werden kann, umfaßt ein Gehäuse (1), das eine Austrittsöffnung (2) aufweist, eine im Gehäuse (1) angeordnete und von der Wand des Gehäuses (1) wärmeisolierte Brennkammer (3), in der eine pyrotechnische Zusammensetzung (4) und eine Zündvorrichtung (5) untergebracht sind, einen Kühlblock (9) und einen Block (6) zur katalytischen vollständigen Oxidation, der zwei im Abstand angeordnete metallische Gitter (8a, 8b) aufweist, zwischen denen katalytisch aktiver Stoff angeordnet ist, und der in einem festen Abstand zur pyrotechnischen Zusammensetzung (4) angeordnet ist. Es ist eine Kompensationseinrichtung (10) vorgesehen ist, die den festen Abstand während des Brennprozesses der pyrotechnischen Zusammensetzung (4) aufrechterhält. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 39/00; A62C 5/00; A62D 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61D 1/06 (2006.01); A62C 5/00 (2006.01); A62C 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 99/0018 (2013.01); A61D 1/06 (2013.01); A62C 5/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976423 A1 20000202; EP 0976423 B1 20041006; AU 4105299 A 20000224; AU 750077 B2 20020711; BR 9903251 A 20000418; CA 2276382 A1 20000130; CA 2276382 C 20071211; DE 19909083 A1 20000203; DE 19909083 C2 20020314; DE 59910706 D1 20041111; NO 318285 B1 20050228; NO 992765 A 20000131; NO 992765 D0 19990608; US 6089326 A 20000718

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160624

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150617

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100707

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-05-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050125

2005-01-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910706

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI