Global patent index - EP 0976427 A1

EP 0976427 A1 2000-02-02 - Sliding board for alpine skiing or snow surfing

Title (en)

Sliding board for alpine skiing or snow surfing

Title (de)

Gleitbrett für Alpineski oder Snowboarding

Title (fr)

Planche de glisse utilisee pour la pratique du ski alpin, ou du surf de neige

Publication

EP 0976427 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99112991 A

Priority

FR 9809966 A

Abstract (en)

The slide board comprises a central core (4), a slide block, 1 lower reinforcement layer and 1 upper reinforcement layer located on both sides of the board. An upper reinforcement layer is formed from two strips (10, 11) which are different in nature and extend onto each other from the central zone towards both ends. The strips (10, 11) are differentiated by the nature of the reinforcement material, or, in the case of 2 fiber-reinforced resin strips, by fiber orientation or weight. In the case of skis, the strips (10, 11) are superposed in the central zone of the board and reinforce the area of the ski where retaining elements are to be mounted.

Abstract (fr)

La planche de glisse selon l'invention comprend un noyau central (4), une semelle de glisse, au moins une couche de renfort inférieure, au moins une couche de renfort supérieure situées de part et d'autre de la planche. Elle est caractérisée par le fait qu'au moins la couche de renfort supérieure est formée de deux bandes de nature différentes (10, 11), qui s'étendent dans le prolongement l'une de l'autre respectivement depuis la zone centrale du ski vers l'une et l'autre de ses extrémités, les bandes présentant une nature différente par la nature du matériau de renfort utilisé, ou dans le cas de deux bandes de résine armée de fibres, par l'orientation des fibres, ou le grammage des fibres. Selon une caractéristique complémentaire, dans le cas d'un ski, les bandes de natures différentes (10, 11) se superposent dans la zone centrale de la planche et renforcent la zone du ski où est prévu le montage des éléments de retenue. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976427 A1 20000202; EP 0976427 B1 20040512; AT 266448 T 20040515; DE 69917149 D1 20040617; DE 69917149 T2 20041111; FR 2781686 A1 20000204; FR 2781686 B1 20001215; JP 3065950 U 20000208; US 6406054 B1 20020618

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150706

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 266448

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20150706

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69917149

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20150318

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140702

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110712

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-03-31 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: SALOMON S.A.S.; FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: SP73

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SALOMON S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2004-08-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040823

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69917149

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI

2004-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: RO SI

2004-05-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2000-11-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH ES IT LI

2000-10-18 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20000727;SI PAYMENT 20000727

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI