Global Patent Index - EP 0976428 A1

EP 0976428 A1 2000-02-02 - Trekking pole with shock absorber

Title (en)

Trekking pole with shock absorber

Title (de)

Trekkingstock mit Stossdämpfer

Title (fr)

Bâton de trekking avec amortisseur

Publication

EP 0976428 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113370 A

Priority

DE 29813601 U

Abstract (en)

The stick has a damping rod (26) and a guide sheath (16) which is part of a first stick portion (13) between which a spring element (29) is disposed. The rod can be fixed in different axial positions along the sheath. The sheath is fixed to second stick portion (14).

Abstract (de)

Ein Stock (10), wie Trekking-, Ski-, Wanderstock, ist mit einem Stoßdämpfer (11) zwischen einem ersten und einem zweiten Rohrteil (13, 14) eines mit Handgriff und Stockspitze versehenen Stockrohres (12) versehen, wobei der Stoßdämpfer (11) eine in einem Rohrteil (13, 14) drehfest gehaltene Führungshülse (16), in der eine am anderen Rohrteil (13, 14) axial festgehaltene Dämpferstange (26) geführt ist, und ein Druckfederelement (29) zwischen Führungshülse (16) und Dämpferstange (26) aufweist. Damit der Stock einerseits die bisherigen Stoßdämpfereigenschaften nach wie vor beinhaltet aber andererseits zusätzlich dem Benutzer die Möglichkeit eröffnet, die Stoßdämpfereigenschaft, wie Härte des Stoßdämpfers, nach seinen Bedürfnissen und / oder nach aktuellen Erfordernissen des Geländes variabel einzustellen, ist vorgesehen, dass die Dämpferstange (26) in und gegenüber der Führungshülse (16) in unterschiedlichen axialen Lagen festlegbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/221 (2013.01); A63C 2203/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29813601 U1 19991216; AT 269130 T 20040715; EP 0976428 A1 20000202; EP 0976428 B1 20040616

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150710

2016-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 269130 T

- Effective date: 20150710

2015-05-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909729

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909729

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: LEKISPORT AG, CH

- Document: AT 269130 T

- Effective date: 20140303

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEKISPORT AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LENHART, KLAUS, 73275 OHMDEN, DE

- Document: DE 59909729

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-10-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909729

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-10-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909729

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130822

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909729 P 20040722

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB IT LI

2004-06-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-06-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040616

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE GB IT LI

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000224

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB IT LI

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI