Global Patent Index - EP 0976433 A2

EP 0976433 A2 2000-02-02 - Coupling device for a toy vehicle

Title (en)

Coupling device for a toy vehicle

Title (de)

Kupplungseinrichtung für ein Spielzeugfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'accouplement pour un véhicule-jouet

Publication

EP 0976433 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99107632 A

Priority

DE 29813630 U

Abstract (en)

One half of the coupling is formed as a horizontally disposed sleeve (3) with a transverse wall (4) and which has a X-shaped, Y-shaped or cross-shaped recess (5) in which engages a torsion spring-form spigot (9) with the same cross-sectional shape forming the other half of the coupling. Interlocking elements formed as vertical spring tabs (6,10,11) on both sides of the spigot or sleeve ensure locking in the axial direction when fully pushed in, and permit a pivoting motion of the trailer vehicle.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Kupplungseinrichtung zur Verbindung eines Spielzeugfahrzeugs mit einem von diesem geschobenen oder gezogenen Anhängefahrzeug, wie einem Zusatzgerät, Anhänger oder dergleichen, wobei am ziehenden Fahrzeug und am Anhängefahrzeug formschlüssig ineinandergreifende Kupplungsteile angeordnet sind, ist es vorgesehen, daß eines der Kupplungsteile als horizontal angeordnete Hülse (3) mit einer Querwand (4) ausgebildet ist, die eine X-förmige-Y-förmige oder kreuzförmige Ausnehmung (5) aufweist, wobei das andere Kupplungsteil als torsionsfederartiger Zapfen (9) ausgebildet ist, der einen X-, Y- oder kreuzförmigen Querschnitt aufweist und in die Ausnehmung (5) in der Querwand (4) eingreift, und wobei Rastelemente (6, 10, 11) vorgesehen sind, welche in axialer Richtung eine Verriegelung in der vollständig eingeschobenen Position gewährleisten und eine Schwenkbewegung des Anhängefahrzeugs ermöglichen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 17/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 17/00 (2006.01); A63H 17/26 (2006.01); B60D 1/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 17/264 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29813630 U1 19981015; AT 262968 T 20040415; DE 59909001 D1 20040506; EP 0976433 A2 20000202; EP 0976433 A3 20021030; EP 0976433 B1 20040331; ES 2217643 T3 20041101

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160617

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070416

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060417

2006-12-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060417

2006-04-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060417

2006-04-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060416

2005-04-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050422

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-03-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050322

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050321

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217643 T3

2004-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-07-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909001 P 20040506

2004-05-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020924

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI