Global Patent Index - EP 0976441 A1

EP 0976441 A1 2000-02-02 - Apparatus for the aeration of water, beverages and liquids in general

Title (en)

Apparatus for the aeration of water, beverages and liquids in general

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für die Belüftung von Wasser, Getränken und Flüssigkeiten im allgemeinem.

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'aération de l'eau, des boissons et des liquides en générales

Publication

EP 0976441 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830468 A

Priority

EP 98830468 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus (10) for the aeration of water, beverages and liquids in general, comprises a tank (11) provided with one or more inlets (17) connected to a supply (A) of the liquid to be aerated, one or more inlets (19) connected to a source (B) of gas under pressure, and one or more outlets (21) for removal of the aerated liquid, and also comprises valves (18, 20, 22) which regulate the flow of fluid along each inlet (17, 19) and each outlet (21); at least one rotating member (24) provided with agitating means is housed in a freely rotatable manner inside the tank (11) and is arranged opposite the gas inlet so as to be actuated by the gas introduced into the tank (11) and so as to agitate the liquid to be aerated which has been introduced into the tank (11). This apparatus is simple, reliable, low-cost and requires little maintenance. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 3/04; A23L 2/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/04 (2006.01); B01F 15/02 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/00155 (2013.01); B01F 3/04531 (2013.01); B01F 3/04808 (2013.01); B01F 3/04836 (2013.01); B01F 15/02 (2013.01); B01F 15/005 (2013.01); B01F 2003/04709 (2013.01); B01F 2003/04865 (2013.01); B01F 2215/0022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976441 A1 20000202

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030201

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010806

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI