Global Patent Index - EP 0976458 A2

EP 0976458 A2 2000-02-02 - Device for discharging flowable materials from flexible tubular bags

Title (en)

Device for discharging flowable materials from flexible tubular bags

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Ausgabe von fliessfähigen Substanzen aus Folienschläuchen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de distribution de matériaux fluides contenus dans des poches tubulaires souples

Publication

EP 0976458 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114912 A

Priority

DE 29813684 U

Abstract (en)

The appliance has a closure element (2) and a flange (3) fastened to the bag (1). The bag is positioned between a piston (10) and a discharge aperture (11). A collar seal (4) on the flange is in sealing contact with the housing aperture (9). The seal is subjected to elastic deformation to generate pretension during discharge of the paste material, esp. dental impression material.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Anordnung zur Ausgabe fließfähiger Substanzen, wie beispielsweise dentale Abformmassen, aus Folienschläuchen (1), wobei ein Abdichtelement in Form einer Kragendichtung (4) die sichere und exakte Ausgabe der Substanz aus dem Folienbeutel (1) sicherstellt. Die Folienschläuchen (1) sind mit mindestens einem Verschlußelement und mindestens einem Flansch (3), der mit dem Folienbeutel (1) fest verbunden ist, ausgestattet. Der Folienschlauch (1) ist zwischen einem verschiebbaren Kolben (10) und einer Ausbringöffnung (11) angeordnet. Die erfindungsgemäße Anordnung, bestehend im wesentlichen aus einer Kragendichtung (4) am Flansch (3), wirkt mit der Ausbringöffnung (11) des Ausbringgehäuses beim Ausbringen der fließfähigen Substanz aus dem Folienbeutel (1) abdichtend zusammen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 17/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/00 (2006.01); B05C 17/005 (2006.01); B05C 17/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/00583 (2013.01); B65D 83/0072 (2013.01); B05C 17/01 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29813684 U1 19981217; DE 19936045 A1 20000127; EP 0976458 A2 20000202; EP 0976458 A3 20020529

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-03-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 05C 17/01 A, 7B 65D 83/00 B, 7B 05C 17/005 B

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI