Global Patent Index - EP 0976459 B1

EP 0976459 B1 2004-12-01 - Coated shaped body, especially painted bodywork of a motor vehicle

Title (en)

Coated shaped body, especially painted bodywork of a motor vehicle

Title (de)

Oberflächenbeschichteter Formkörper, insbesondere lackierte Kraftfahrzeugkarosserie

Title (fr)

Objets façonnés revêtus et plus particulièrement carrosserie peinte de véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 0976459 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113951 A

Priority

DE 19834490 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0976459A2] A surface coated molding, especially a lacquered vehicle chassis, comprises premolded sections with invisible joints. An adhesive seam (8) bridges a trough section at a connection point (1). The adhesive seam is covered by a surface coating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976459 A2 20000202; EP 0976459 A3 20030402; EP 0976459 B1 20041201; DE 19834490 A1 20000203; ES 2229593 T3 20050416

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110718

2013-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130606

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110717

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110717

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110717

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100721

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100802

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100721

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100707

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-10-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2229593 T3

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911169 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI