Global Patent Index - EP 0976506 A1

EP 0976506 A1 2000-02-02 - Tool holder for drills or chisels

Title (en)

Tool holder for drills or chisels

Title (de)

Werkzeughalter für Bohr-und Meisselgeräte

Title (fr)

Porte-outil pour forets et ciseaux

Publication

EP 0976506 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810533 A

Priority

DE 19834503 A

Abstract (en)

The implement (2) is held in a container-sleeve (1) which has at least one opening through it (12) and which is enclosed by an operating sleeve (7) movable contrary to the direction of operation against spring (8) force. At least one locking element (6) tilts to a restricted extent on a swivel axis at right angles to the lengthwise axis of the container sleeve (1). The locking element goes through at least part of the opening through the container-sleeve and protrudes inside the container-sleeve enclosed by a guide ring (5). At least part of the locking element is gripped by the guide ring, thereby preventing the locking element from tilting into a release position. The locking element is connected to the operating sleeve.

Abstract (de)

Der Werkzeughalter für Bohr- und/oder Meisselgeräte weist eine Aufnahmehülse (1) mit wenigstens einer Durchtrittsöffnung (12), und eine entgegen der Bearbeitungsrichtung gegen die Kraft einer Feder (8) versetzbare Betätigungshülse (7) auf, mit der wenigstens ein um eine senkrecht zur Längsachse der Aufnahmehülse (1) ausgerichtete Schwenkachse (S) kippbares Verriegelungselement (6) in Verbindung steht. Das mit der Betätigungshülse (7) in Verbindung stehende Verriegelungselement (6) wirkt in der Verriegelungsstellung des Werkzeughalters mit einem das Verriegelungselement (6) umgebenden Führungsring (5) zusammen und ragt die Durchtrittsöffnung (12) durchsetzend teilweise in die lichte Weite der Aufnahmehülse (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 17/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 31/107 (2006.01); B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25D 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/088 (2013.01); Y10S 279/906 (2013.01); Y10T 279/17076 (2013.01); Y10T 279/17162 (2013.01); Y10T 279/17264 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 29612795 U1 19971120 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976506 A1 20000202; EP 0976506 B1 20020814; CN 1116150 C 20030730; CN 1247782 A 20000322; DE 19834503 A1 20000203; JP 2000052114 A 20000222; JP 4256539 B2 20090422; US 6135461 A 20001024

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-06-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170614

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2004-06-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040603

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-01-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB LI NL SE

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020128

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH FR GB LI NL SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB LI NL SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI