Global Patent Index - EP 0976509 A2

EP 0976509 A2 2000-02-02 - Method and apparatus for slitting web material

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for slitting web material

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Längsschneiden einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Méthode ansi que dispositif pour découper longitudinalement un matériau en bande

Publication

EP 0976509 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112151 A

Priority

DE 19832871 A

Abstract (en)

Longitudinal cutting is carried out so that the position of the cutting edge (11) is determined directly on the carrier (4), and the position of the carrier (4) in the machine frame is determined. In addition the absolute position of the knife edge (11) in the machine frame is formed by the combination of these two position determinations. At least the position of the knife edge (11) on the carrier (4) is determined by the measuring of a distance (II, IV) between the knife edge (11) and a carried fixed first fixing point (13).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Längsschneiden einer in Laufrichtung laufenden Materialbahn angegeben, bei denen mindestens eine Messereinheit (7, 9), die eine Schneidkante (11) aufweist und auf einem Träger (4) angeordnet ist, der in einem Maschinengestell (5) quer zur Laufrichtung verschiebbar ist, positioniert wird und eine Meßeinrichtung die Position ermittelt. Man möchte die Positionsermittlung verbessern. Hierzu weist die Meßeinrichtung zwei Meßwertgeber auf, von denen ein erster Meßwertgeber (12) auf dem Träger (4) angeordnet ist und die Entfernung (II, IV) der Schneidkante (11) zu einem trägerfesten Fixpunkt (13) ermittelt, und ein zweiter Meßwertgeber (14, 15) die Entfernung eines trägerfesten Fixpunkts von einen im Maschinengestell (5) ortsfesten Nullpunkt (O) ermittelt. Die absolute Position der Schneidkante (11) durch die Kombination der beiden Entfernungen gebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/2635 (2013.01); B26D 2007/2657 (2013.01); Y10T 83/7826 (2015.04); Y10T 83/7847 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8822 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9471 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976509 A2 20000202; EP 0976509 A3 20021204; EP 0976509 B1 20040225; DE 19832871 C1 20000531; US 6382066 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060624

2005-06-16 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050616

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050613

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041126

2005-02-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-08-25 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908623

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI