Global Patent Index - EP 0976509 A3

EP 0976509 A3 2002-12-04 - Method and apparatus for slitting web material

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for slitting web material

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Längsschneiden einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Méthode ansi que dispositif pour découper longitudinalement un matériau en bande

Publication

EP 0976509 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99112151 A

Priority

DE 19832871 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0976509A2] Longitudinal cutting is carried out so that the position of the cutting edge (11) is determined directly on the carrier (4), and the position of the carrier (4) in the machine frame is determined. In addition the absolute position of the knife edge (11) in the machine frame is formed by the combination of these two position determinations. At least the position of the knife edge (11) on the carrier (4) is determined by the measuring of a distance (II, IV) between the knife edge (11) and a carried fixed first fixing point (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/2635 (2013.01); B26D 2007/2657 (2013.01); Y10T 83/7826 (2015.04); Y10T 83/7847 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8822 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9471 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976509 A2 20000202; EP 0976509 A3 20021204; EP 0976509 B1 20040225; DE 19832871 C1 20000531; US 6382066 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060624

2005-06-16 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050616

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050613

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2005-02-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-25 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908623 P 20040401

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI