Global Patent Index - EP 0976513 A1

EP 0976513 A1 2000-02-02 - Stone splitter with a pressurizer comprising a plastic sachet

Title (en)

Stone splitter with a pressurizer comprising a plastic sachet

Title (de)

Steinspalter mit einem aus einer Kunststoffhülle bestehenden Druckerzeuger

Title (fr)

Machine à couper de la pierre ayant un générateur de presssion sous forme de sachet

Publication

EP 0976513 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111272 A

Priority

  • DE 19832372 A
  • DE 19842670 A

Abstract (en)

A stone splitter comprises a frame carrying a work table, a carrier supported by the frame, blades located parallel to the carrier, and a hydraulic unit pressure unit for moving the blades together. The pressure unit consists of a longitudinal sleeve. The stone splitter comprises a frame carrying a work table, a carrier supported by the frame, blades located parallel to the carrier, and a hydraulic unit pressure unit for moving the blades together. The pressure unit consists of a longitudinal plastic sleeve (11) which can be hydraulically inflated. The unit is located between the blade holder (5) and the carrier (9), and has a connection nipple (13) supplying pressurizing oil.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen Steinspalter, bei dem die Bewegung der Schneiden (6) auf die Gegenschneide (3) zu durch einen hydraulischen Druckerzeuger (10) bewirkt wird, der aus einer allseits geschlossenen Kunststoffhülle (11) besteht, in der ein Anschlußnippel (13) zur Zuführung von Drucköl eingesetzt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/222 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976513 A1 20000202

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020712

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020426

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI