Global patent index - EP 0976549 A1

EP 0976549 A1 2000-02-02 - Processless thermal printing plate with well defined nanostructure

Title (en)

Processless thermal printing plate with well defined nanostructure

Title (de)

Verarbeitungsfreie thermische Flachdruckplatte mit definierter Nanostruktur

Title (fr)

Plaque lithographique thermique sans traitement avec nanostructure bien déterminée

Publication

EP 0976549 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98202576 A

Priority

EP 98202576 A

Abstract (en)

According to the present invention there is provided a heat-sensitive material for making lithographic printing plates comprising on a lithographic support an image-forming layer comprising a hydrophilic binder, a cross-linking agent for said hydrophilic binder, metal oxide particles with a mean diameter of at least 100 nm and dispersed hydrophobic thermoplastic polymer particles, characterized in that said image-forming layer has a ratio of specific surface (in m<2> per g) over mean roughness( in mu m) of more than 0.65 and that the mean pore width is less than 15 nm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10; B41M 5/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/004 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 5/36 (2006.01); B41N 1/14 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1025 (2013.01); B41M 5/368 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/08 (2013.01); B41C 2210/22 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] EP 0770494 A2 19970502 - AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]
  • [DA] "A LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 333, 1 January 1992 (1992-01-01), pages 2, XP000281114

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976549 A1 20000202; EP 0976549 B1 20031001; DE 69818659 D1 20031106; DE 69818659 T2 20040812; JP 2000079771 A 20000321

INPADOC legal status

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69818659

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130731

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120618

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120706

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120618

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69818659

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-10-01 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI