Global Patent Index - EP 0976552 A1

EP 0976552 A1 2000-02-02 - Bearing for a cylinder in a printing machine

Title (en)

Bearing for a cylinder in a printing machine

Title (de)

Lagerung für einen Zylinder in einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Palier pour un cylindre dans une machine d'impression

Publication

EP 0976552 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99108038 A

Priority

DE 19833113 A

Abstract (en)

A lever (13) protruding radially from the cylinder (1) to which it is screwed serves to move the cylinder from a fixed servo motor (6) in a peripheral direction. The cylinder is rotarily mounted by eccentric bearings to the housing walls (4) of a machine framework. One eccentric bearing is pivot mounted in the housing walls of a machine frame. One eccentric bearing has an internally grooved (8) outer ring (2) with a concentric hole containing an inner ring (3) fixed onto the cylinder, with fixed inner ring

Abstract (de)

Eine Lagerung für einen Zylinder (1) in einer Druckmaschine weist erfindungsgemäß einen an dem Zylinder (1) befestigten und von diesem radial abstehenden Hebel (13) auf, über welchen der Zylinder (1) von einem ortsfest angeordneten Servomotor (6) in Umfangsrichtung verstellbar ist. Diese Anordnung ermöglicht es, bei einem verstellbaren Zylinder in einer Druckmaschine auf hydraulische oder pneumatische Arbeitszylinder gänzlich zu verzichten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/38 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0492102 A1 19920701 - ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833113 A1 20000127; EP 0976552 A1 20000202

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040323

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INA-SCHAEFFLER KG

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020627

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990423

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI