Global patent index - EP 0976554 A1

EP 0976554 A1 2000-02-02 - Method for transferring the trailing edge of a sheet from a cylinder in a sheet printing press

Title (en)

Method for transferring the trailing edge of a sheet from a cylinder in a sheet printing press

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Übernahme einer Bogenhinterkante von einem vorgeordneten Zylinder einer Bogenrotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour transférer le bord arrière d'une feuille d'un cylindre dans une machine pour imprimer des feuilles

Publication

EP 0976554 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112547 A

Priority

DE 19833903 A

Abstract (en)

A vacuum gripper (4) in the back part of the back edge (6) of the sheets is placed on the sheets (1). During transfer of the sheets, the suction gripper follows the periphery of the cylinder (2) belonging to the rotary sheet-fed printer. The vacuum gripper is guided into the periphery of the turning drum (3) at a constant tangent, and performs a relative movement towards the tangent. When the vacuum gripper has reached the t transfer position on the gripper system (25) it executes a relative movement towards the sheet-feed direction.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Übernahme einer Bogenhinterkante von einem Zylinder (2) einer Bogenrotationsdruckmaschine und Übergabe der Bogenhinterkante (6) an ein Greifersystem (25,26) einer Wendetrommel (3) ist es vorgesehen, einen Sauggreifer (4) zunächst entlang der Peripherie des Zylinders (2) zu führen, bis der Sauggreifer die Bogenhinterkante sicher erfaßt hat, daraufhin die Hinterkante tangentenstetig zum Zylindermantel des vorgeordneten Zylinders in die Peripherie der Wendetrommel zu führen, wobei ein Straffen und Stauchen des Bogens entlang einer Tangente des Zylinders erfolgt und daraufhin zugfrei an das Greifersystem der Wendetrommel zu übergeben. Eine hierzu vorgesehene Getriebevorrichtung umfaßt drei miteinander gekoppelte Antriebssysteme, die über stationäre Kurven gesteuert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/05 (2006.01); B41F 13/24 (2006.01); B41F 21/06 (2006.01); B41F 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/108 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976554 A1 20000202; EP 0976554 B1 20030924; CN 1131779 C 20031224; CN 1243063 A 20000202; CZ 293398 B6 20040414; CZ 9901717 A3 20000216; DE 19833903 A1 20000203; HK 1022872 A1 20040924; JP 2000043239 A 20000215; RU 2244629 C2 20050120; US 6401610 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040731

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-07-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2005-06-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050620

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040721

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907088

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020514

2000-11-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991213

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI