Global Patent Index - EP 0976566 A1

EP 0976566 A1 2000-02-02 - Driving arrangement for printhead

Title (en)

Driving arrangement for printhead

Title (de)

Antriebsanordnung für einen Schreibkopf

Title (fr)

Arrangement pour activer pour une tête d'impression

Publication

EP 0976566 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99305806 A

Priority

DE 19833782 A

Abstract (en)

A piezoelectric actuator (4), separate from the lever assembly (1d) is used. The lever assembly exerts compressive force on the piezoelectric actuator, which is supported on a rigid abutment. An Independent claim is included for use as a transducer, producing a signal from deflection.

Abstract (de)

Eine Antriebsanordnung, beispielsweise für einen Schreibkopf, die eine piezoelektrisch betätigte Hebelanordnung (ld) umfaßt, um eine Schreibspitze (21) in Richtung eines Aufzeichnungsträgers zu bewegen, wenn auf dem Aufzeichnungsträger geschrieben wird. Diese Antriebsordnung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß ein von der Hebelanordnung (1d) getrennter, piezoelektrischer Aktuator (4) verwendet wird, und daß die Hebelanordnung (1d) eine komprimierende Kraft auf den piezoelektrischen Aktuator (4) ausübt, welcher an einer starren Widerlage (Abschnitt 1b) abgestützt ist. Diese Antriebsanordnung kann für eine Reihe von anderen Anwendungen als Stellantrieb benutzt werden. Auch sind inverse Anordnungen beschrieben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/295

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/295 (2006.01); H02N 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/295 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976566 A1 20000202; DE 19833782 A1 20000203; US 6331037 B1 20011218

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020527

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000411

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000118

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI