Global Patent Index - EP 0976571 A1

EP 0976571 A1 2000-02-02 - Porous inkjet recording elements

Title (en)

Porous inkjet recording elements

Title (de)

Poröse Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungselemente

Title (fr)

Eléments poreux pour l'enregistrement par jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0976571 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202390 A

Priority

US 12753498 A

Abstract (en)

An inkjet recording medium comprising a substrate coated on at least one surface with a coating composition comprising a mixture of inorganiccolloidal particles and non-colloidal pigments.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/5218 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976571 A1 20000202; JP 2000052638 A 20000222

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011109

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000708

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI