Global patent index - EP 0976573 A1

EP 0976573 A1 2000-02-02 - Flexibly supported lithographic printing plate having an improved dimensional stability

Title (en)

Flexibly supported lithographic printing plate having an improved dimensional stability

Title (de)

Flexibel laminierte lithographische Druckplatte mit verbesserter Dimensionsstabilität

Title (fr)

Cliché flexible supporté pour l'impression lithographique ayant une stabilité dimensionnelle améliorée

Publication

EP 0976573 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98202539 A

Priority

EP 98202539 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides an element comprising on a flexible support a lithographic surface having ink accepting and ink repellent areas or a latent lithographic surface resulting in a lithographic surface upon development, said imaging element being laminated with its side opposite to the lithographic surface to a dimensionally stable assembly, the imaging element having a high friction coefficient with respect to the dimensionally stable assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 6/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/00 (2006.01); B41N 1/14 (2006.01); B41N 6/00 (2006.01); B41N 6/02 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 1/086 (2013.01); B41C 1/10 (2013.01); B41C 2201/06 (2013.01); B41M 1/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976573 A1 20000202; JP 2000043438 A 20000215

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030318

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI