Global Patent Index - EP 0976576 B1

EP 0976576 B1 2000-09-06 - Suspending device for suspended folder or file

Title (en)

Suspending device for suspended folder or file

Title (de)

Aufhängevorrichtung für Hängeordner bzw.-registraturen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de suspension pour classeur ou dossier suspendu

Publication

EP 0976576 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98122943 A

Priority

DE 29813736 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0976576A1] The suspension device (1) has a first open-edge recess (3) for part of a suspension rail, a first nose (7) fitting in this recess with a root (9) to receive a suspension rail element of a suspension rail (50), a second nose (10) in the same recess with a root (11) also for a hanging rail element. The second nose has a support sector (21, 22) to take a further suspension rail element. There is a second open-edge recess (27) spaced out from the first one to receive yet another suspension rail element.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Aufhängevorrichtung (1) für Hängeordner bzw. -registraturen mit einer ersten randoffenen Ausnehmung (3), die zur Aufnahme wenigstens eines Teils einer Hängeschiene dient, einer ersten Nase (7), die sich in der randoffenen Ausnehmung erstreckt und deren bogenförmige Wurzel zur Aufnahme eines Hängeschienenelements der Hängeschiene dient, einer zweiten Nase (10), die sich ebenfalls in die randoffene Ausnehmung erstreckt und deren bogenförmige Wurzel (11) ebenfalls zur Aufnahme eines Hängeschienenelements dient, wobei die zweite Nase einen Abstützabschnitt (21,22) aufweist, der zur Anlage eines weiteren Hängeschienenelements dient und eine zweite randoffene Ausnehmung (27) vorgesehen ist, die im Abstand zur ersten randoffenen Ausnehmung angeordnet ist und zur Aufnahme eines weiteren Hängeschienenelements dient. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 15/0047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29813736 U1 19990715; AT 196119 T 20000915; EP 0976576 A1 20000202; EP 0976576 B1 20000906; ES 2153230 T3 20010216

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151203

2016-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-09-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 196119

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20151203

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151230

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DANZER PRODUKTE GMBH VOGT & SOEHNE, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59800262

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-12-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59800262

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KROHER - STROBEL RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE PA, DE

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091203

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DANZER ORGANISATION & SYSTEME G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051205

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051205

2004-12-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041215

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041214

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-13 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2153230

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800262

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-12

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR LI LU NL

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR LI LU NL

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 196119

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990622

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI