Global Patent Index - EP 0976604 A2

EP 0976604 A2 2000-02-02 - Method for deriving target torque of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method for deriving target torque of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Beeinflussung des Drehmoments einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour déterminer une valeur du couple désirée dans un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0976604 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113013 A

Priority

DE 19834532 A

Abstract (en)

The method for influencing the torque of the IC engine is carried out with the gearbox control unit (2) supplies input signals (nTAU, TAU 01, RHO 01,n ab) to the engine control unit (1), which depending on these input signals, determines a gearbox input torque (MG) as the sum of a converter torque (MW) and a gearbox oil pump torque (M rho) for the compensating of the torque loss.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Beeinflussung des Drehmoments einer Brennkraftmaschine bei einem Kraftfahrzeug mit einem automatischen Stufengetriebe, mit einem hydrodynamischen Wandler, mit einer Getriebeölpumpe, mit einem elektronischen Brennkraftmaschinensteuergerät (1) und mit einem elektronischen Getriebesteuergerät (2) übermittelt das Getriebesteuergerät (2) ihm vorliegende Eingangssignale (nT,TÖl,PÖl,nab) an das Brennkraftmaschinensteuergerät (1), welches in Abhängigkeit von diesen Eingangssignalen ein Getriebeeingangsmoment (Mg) als Summe eines Wandlermoments (Mw) und eines Getriebeölpumpenmoments (Mp) zur Kompensierung des Verlustmoments ermittelt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60K 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 26/00 (2006.01); B60W 30/18 (2012.01); F02D 29/02 (2006.01); F16H 63/40 (2006.01); F16H 63/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60W 30/18 (2013.01); B60W 10/04 (2013.01); B60W 10/10 (2013.01); B60W 30/1819 (2013.01); F16H 63/50 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • DE 19726194 A1 19981224 - BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]
  • DE 2935916 C2 19891214
  • "kraftfahrttechnischen taschenbuch der fa. bosch", 1987, VDI- VERLAG, 20.AUFLAGE, pages: 460-470
  • 1992, article "atz- artikel "elektronische getriebesteuerung von bosch"", pages: 424 FF

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976604 A2 20000202; EP 0976604 A3 20010110; EP 0976604 B1 20030514; DE 19834532 A1 20000203; ES 2196678 T3 20031216

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160707

2017-03-07 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150706

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150706

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150706

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905533

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140731

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140728

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140731

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140725

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196678 T3

2003-09-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905533 P 20030618

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020624

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010127

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI