Global Patent Index - EP 0976637 A1

EP 0976637 A1 2000-02-02 - Safety device for the forced execution and the control of the gripping at the exit from a station for a continuous motion single cable cableway with temporary disconnection of the cars

Title (en)

Safety device for the forced execution and the control of the gripping at the exit from a station for a continuous motion single cable cableway with temporary disconnection of the cars

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung für die erzwungene Durchführung und Kontrolle des Ankuppelns beim Verlassen einer Station für eine Einseil-Umlaufseilbahn mit zeitweiliger Abkupplung der Kabinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'exécution forcée et le contrôle d'accouplage à la sortie d'une station pour un téléphérique monocable à boucle fermée avec désaccouplement temporaire des cabines

Publication

EP 0976637 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99201290 A

Priority

IT MI981812 A

Abstract (en)

A safety device is described for the forced execution and the control of the gripping of a car onto a cable before its exit from a station for single cable cableway. The safety device comprises a plurality of mechanical guides (22, 23, 24, 26) inserted along the path that is run by a gripping vice (8) of the car inside the station in order to force the same vice (8) to close itself again on the cable (1) before the exit of the car from the station. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 12/12; B61B 12/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/06 (2006.01); B61B 12/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/06 (2013.01); B61B 12/122 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976637 A1 20000202; IT 1302139 B1 20000731; IT MI981812 A1 20000131; IT MI981812 D0 19980731

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021105

2000-11-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI SE

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES LI

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI