Global Patent Index - EP 0976660 A1

EP 0976660 A1 2000-02-02 - Package for a group of articles and process for its manufacture

Title (en)

Package for a group of articles and process for its manufacture

Title (de)

Tray-Packung für eine Gruppe von Gegenständen sowie Verfahren zum Herstellen derselben

Title (fr)

Emballage pour un groupe d'articles et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0976660 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113495 A

Priority

DE 19834024 A

Abstract (en)

The packaging, for a number of single packets, has a base (17), side lengthwise walls (13,14), side transverse walls (15,16) and upright corners struts (25,26) protruding above the lengthwise and transverse walls. The base consists of base, lengthwise (20,21) and transverse (18,19) flaps parts of which, as regards their size and shape between adjoining corner struts, match cavities (29,30) near the lengthwise and or transverse walls. The outer lengthwise flaps are wider in relation to the dimensions of the cavities by a strip of material or bridge-piece (36) facing the lengthwise walls so that, preferably, the lengthwise flaps are each half the width of the base and abut near a central dividing line.

Abstract (de)

Traypackungen (12) sind oben offene Packungen aus Karton oder dergleichen mit Seitenwänden, nämlich Längswänden (13, 14) sowie Querwänden (15, 16), geringer Höhe. Zur Verbesserung der Formstabilität der Traypackung (12) sind im Bereich von Ecken aufrechte, im Querschnitt winkelförmige Eckstützen (25, 26) vorgesehen, deren Höhe etwa der Höhe der Einzelpackungen bzw. Gegenstände entspricht. Eine Bodenwand (17) besteht aus Bodenlappen, nämlich Querlappen (18, 19) und Längslappen (20, 21), die in Form und Größe Ausnehmungen (29, 30) entsprechen, die oberhalb der Seitenwände (13..16) in Verbindung mit den Eckstützen (25, 26) gebildet sind. Dadurch können Zuschnitte für die Traypackung (12) weitgehend verlustfrei von einer fortlaufenden Materialbahn gefertigt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/02; B31B 5/78; B65B 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 5/08 (2006.01); B31B 1/16 (2006.01); B31B 1/26 (2006.01); B31B 1/62 (2006.01); B31B 5/78 (2006.01); B65B 5/06 (2006.01); B65D 5/02 (2006.01); B65D 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/0227 (2013.01); B65B 5/068 (2013.01); B31B 2201/283 (2013.01); B31B 2201/295 (2013.01); B31B 2203/003 (2013.01); Y10S 229/933 (2013.01); Y10S 229/936 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976660 A1 20000202; EP 0976660 B1 20021030; BR 9903001 A 20000328; CA 2278864 A1 20000128; CA 2278864 C 20070522; CN 1100707 C 20030205; CN 1245764 A 20000301; DE 19834024 A1 20000203; JP 2000043845 A 20000215; US 6419090 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59903229

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090713

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100724

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090713

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090713

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20090201

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080716

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070703

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903229

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-05

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010226

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI