Global Patent Index - EP 0976663 A1

EP 0976663 A1 2000-02-02 - Closure with hinged lid

Title (en)

Closure with hinged lid

Title (de)

Aufklappbare Verschlussklappe

Title (fr)

Fermeture à couvercle pivotant

Publication

EP 0976663 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111228 A

Priority

DE 19832799 A

Abstract (en)

Closure cap comprises a fluid tight connection to a container opening, with an upper wall (12) raised region (14) which contains an outlet opening (16) for the medium in the container, and a lid (18) connected to the cap member, with a locking member. The raised region consists of an elastically deformable material and the lid is sealed against the outlet opening edge when in the closed position.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine aufklappbare Verschlußkappe mit einem Verschlußkappenkörper (10), dessen obere Begrenzungswandung (12) einen erhöhten Bereich (14) mit einer Austrittsöffnung (16) aufweist, einem mit dem Verschlußkappenkörper (10) gelenkig verbundenen Klappdeckel (18) und einer am Verschlußkappenkörper (10) und am Klappdeckel (18) ausgebildeten Verriegelungseinrichtung (20, 22, 24, 38, 42), wobei zumindest der erhöhte Bereich (14) aus einem elastisch verformbaren Material besteht, und daß der Klappdeckel (18) in Schließposition zumindest am Rand der Austrittsöffnung (16) dichtend anliegt und den erhöhten Bereich (14) in Schließrichtung mit einer Anpreßkraft beaufschlagt. Weiterhin ist ein an der gelenkigen Verbindung (28) wirksames, aus einem elastisch verformbaren Material bestehendes Element (30) vorgesehen, das zwischen dem Verschlußkappenkörper (10) und dem Klappdeckel (18) eine Vorspannung erzeugt, um den Klappdeckel (18) in eine aufgeklappte Position zu bringen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/0804 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0629560 A2 19941221 - KAO CORP [JP]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19832799 A1 20000127; DE 19832799 B4 20060302; AT 248108 T 20030915; CA 2278078 A1 20000121; CA 2278078 C 20070313; CZ 298819 B6 20080213; CZ 9902515 A3 20000517; EP 0976663 A1 20000202; EP 0976663 B1 20030827; ES 2207072 T3 20040516; PT 976663 E 20040130; US 2001050264 A1 20011213; US 6409034 B2 20020625

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170609

2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170609

2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180103

2018-04-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170609

2018-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170609

2018-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170609

2018-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170701

2018-03-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180228

2018-03-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2018-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170609

2018-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171211

2018-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 248108 T

- Effective date: 20170609

2018-02-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170701

2018-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906748

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160608

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207072 T3

2004-01-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040107

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906748 P 20031002

2003-10-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT

2003-08-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: SI

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010820

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT

2000-10-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990609

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHORNER,HORST

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990609