Global patent index - EP 0976675 A1

EP 0976675 A1 2000-02-02 - Method of force limitation for automatic elevator doors

Title (en)

Method of force limitation for automatic elevator doors

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Kraftbegrenzung für automatische Aufzugstüren

Title (fr)

Méthode de limitation des efforts pour portes automatiques d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 0976675 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114061 A

Priority

  • EP 99114061 A
  • EP 98810733 A

Abstract (en)

The drive force profile in normal operation, interfering forces being absent, is determined from a mathematical model. This profile is compared with the actual drive force measured during use. Departures of given magnitude, which are triggered by mechanical interference, stop or reverse door travel.

Abstract (de)

Dieses System für den Betrieb einer automatischen Aufzugstür besteht aus einem Sollwerterzeuger (1) für die Geschwindigkeit, einem Istwerterfasser (2) der Geschwindigkeit/Türposition, einem Bewegungsregler (3), einem Geschwindigkeitserzeuger (4) in der Form eines Türantriebes und einem Istwerterfasser (5) für die aufgebrachte Antriebskraft. Ein Antriebskraftmodell (6) für die Antriebskraft errechnet aufgrund eines mathematischen Modells und der ermittelten Türparameter die im störkraftfreien Betrieb aufzubringende Antriebskraft. Ein Grenzwerterzeuger (7) berechnet aus dem Antriebskraftmodellwert und einer zulässigen Störkraft einen Kraftgrenzwert, der mittels eines Vergleichers (8) dem Istwert der Antriebskraft gegenübergestellt wird. Beim Überschreiten des Kraftgrenzwertes wird die Tür gestoppt und/oder eine Reversierbewegung ausgelöst. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/143 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976675 A1 20000202; EP 0976675 B1 20031015; EP 0976675 B2 20080813; AT 252049 T 20031115; CN 1102529 C 20030305; CN 1244492 A 20000216; DE 59907349 D1 20031120; HK 1026187 A1 20040305; MY 120366 A 20051031; SG 71932 A1 20000418

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-08-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2008-08-13 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20080813

2008-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2004-09-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG, ABTEILUNG CT IP I&S

- Effective date: 20040713

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907349

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020903

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI