Global Patent Index - EP 0976813 A1

EP 0976813 A1 2000-02-02 - Borate containing additive for manual transmission lubricant being stable to hydrolysis and providing high synchromesh durability

Title (en)

Borate containing additive for manual transmission lubricant being stable to hydrolysis and providing high synchromesh durability

Title (de)

Gegen Hydrolyse beständiges Borat enthaltendes Handschaltgetriebe-Schmieröladditiv zum Erhöhen der Dauerhaftigkeit von Synchrongetrieben

Title (fr)

Additif contenant du borate pour huile de transmission manuelle stable à l'hydrolyse et assurant une durabilité élevée aux boîtes de vitesse synchronisées

Publication

EP 0976813 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98401967 A

Priority

EP 98401967 A

Abstract (en)

The high synchromesh durability performance and gear protection of a manual transmission gear box is provided by adding to gear box a lubricating oil composition having improved water stability and oxidation control. That lubricating oil composition comprises a base oil of lubricating viscosity, an alkali-metal borate, an organic polysulfide, an alkyl succinic acid ester of a polyol, and an overbased sulfurized alkyl or alkenyl salicylate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 163/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 125/26 (2006.01); C10M 129/74 (2006.01); C10M 133/44 (2006.01); C10M 135/22 (2006.01); C10M 135/24 (2006.01); C10M 135/36 (2006.01); C10M 137/04 (2006.01); C10M 159/22 (2006.01); C10M 163/00 (2006.01); C10N 30/00 (2006.01); C10N 30/02 (2006.01); C10N 30/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 30/10 (2006.01); C10N 30/14 (2006.01); C10N 30/18 (2006.01); C10N 40/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 163/00 (2013.01); C10M 2201/087 (2013.01); C10M 2201/10 (2013.01); C10M 2201/102 (2013.01); C10M 2201/105 (2013.01); C10M 2203/10 (2013.01); C10M 2207/028 (2013.01); C10M 2207/262 (2013.01); C10M 2207/287 (2013.01); C10M 2207/288 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2207/34 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/223 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10M 2219/082 (2013.01); C10M 2219/083 (2013.01); C10M 2219/087 (2013.01); C10M 2219/088 (2013.01); C10M 2219/089 (2013.01); C10M 2219/10 (2013.01); C10M 2219/102 (2013.01); C10M 2219/104 (2013.01); C10M 2219/106 (2013.01); C10M 2219/108 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/041 (2013.01); C10N 2240/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/04 (2013.01); C10N 2240/042 (2013.01); C10N 2240/044 (2013.01); C10N 2240/046 (2013.01); C10N 2240/08 (2013.01); C10N 2240/40 (2013.01); C10N 2240/402 (2013.01); C10N 2240/403 (2013.01); C10N 2240/404 (2013.01); C10N 2240/405 (2013.01); C10N 2240/406 (2013.01); C10N 2240/407 (2013.01); C10N 2240/408 (2013.01); C10N 2240/409 (2013.01); C10N 2270/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 163/00 + C10M 125/26 + C10M 129/76 + C10M 129/95 + C10M 133/44 + C10M 135/22 + C10M 135/36 + C10M 137/04 + C10M 159/22

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976813 A1 20000202; EP 0976813 B1 20031210; CA 2273613 A1 20000131; CA 2273613 C 20081007; DE 69820429 D1 20040122; DE 69820429 T2 20041014; JP 2000063870 A 20000229; JP 4460087 B2 20100512; SG 72973 A1 20000523

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160711

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820429 P 20040122

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-09-04 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2002-01-02 [18RR] RE-ESTABLISHED

- Free text: 20011109 ANGENOMMEN

2001-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEVRON ORONITE S.A.

2001-09-26 [18RA] DATE OF RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Effective date: 20010730

2001-08-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI