Global Patent Index - EP 0976820 A1

EP 0976820 A1 2000-02-02 - Multi-layer detergent tablet for laundry washing and its process of production

Title (en)

Multi-layer detergent tablet for laundry washing and its process of production

Title (de)

Mehrschichtige Wäschewaschmittel-Tablette und Verfahren zur Herstellung

Title (fr)

Tablette détergente multicouches pour le lavage du linge et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0976820 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420169 A

Priority

FR 9810024 A

Abstract (en)

Multilayer washing agent tablets with outer layers containing an enzyme system and a core layer containing a peroxide system and a disintegrating agent. Multilayer washing agent tablets for laundering linen, having a sandwich structure with at least three layers comprising (a) two outer layers containing an enzyme system and (b) an inner core layer containing a peroxide system and a disintegrating agent selected such that the core layer has a disintegration time of less than or equal to 80 seconds after complete disintegration of the two outer layers.

Abstract (fr)

Tablette du type multicouches pour le lavage du linge, caractérisée ce qu'elle est constituée d'une structure sandwich comprenant au moins trois couches, respectivement : deux couches externes comprenant un système enzymatique ; une couche centrale comprenant un système peroxydant ; la couche centrale comprenant en outre au moins un agent désintégrant apte à permettre le délitement de ladite couche en une durée inférieure ou égale à 80 secondes après délitement complet des deux couches externes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/12; C11D 3/22; C11D 3/37; C11D 3/386; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0086 (2013.01); C11D 3/386 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01); C11D 3/3945 (2013.01); C11D 17/0078 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976820 A1 20000202; FR 2781810 A1 20000204; FR 2781810 B1 20000915

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030913

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030502

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI